IL SB3594 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Articulation Initiative Act. In the provisions concerning participation, provides that if, in a given academic year, a public institution does not have an equivalent major, lower-division courses, or both that align with the major panel's descriptors and course approval criteria, then the public institution shall be considered to be compliant with those provisions for that academic year, as determined by the Board of Higher Education and the Illinois Community College Board, in coordination with the director of the Illinois Articulation Initiative. Effective immediately.
Title
ILL ARTICULATION INITIATIVE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1022 |
2024-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2024 |
2024-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2024-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2024-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2024-05-17 | House | Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 011-000-000 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 152 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |