IL SB3665 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0693
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0693
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Enhances to aggravated assault or aggravated battery the assault or battery of a letter carrier or postal worker while that individual is performing his or her duties delivering mail for the United States Postal Service. Provides that the robbery of a letter carrier or postal worker while that individual is performing his or her duties delivering mail for the United States Postal Service is a Class 1 (rather than a Class 2) felony.
Title
CD CORR-OFFENSE-LETTER CARRIER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0693 |
2012-06-15 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2013 |
2012-06-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-11 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-25 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2012-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2012-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2012-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2012-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |
2012-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2012-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
2012-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley |
2012-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2012-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2012-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2012-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2012-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2012-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 009-000-000 |
2012-04-25 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-04-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2012-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-29 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2012-03-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Collins |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 006-000-000 |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Mu |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Edward D. Maloney |
2012-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2012 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 1, 2012 |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 005-004-000 |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-3.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 18-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |