IL SB3744 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code. In the definition of "facility director", provides that a designee of the facility director may include a clinical professional counselor. Effective immediately.
Title
MHDD CD-FACIILITY DIRECTOR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-29 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2012-03-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2012 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2012 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 006-000-000 |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine J. Johnson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
405 | 5 | 1-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |