IL SB3798 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public-Private Partnerships for Transportation Act. Provides that each year, at least 30 days prior to the beginning of the responsible public entity's fiscal year, the responsible public entity shall submit to the General Assembly a description of potential projects that the responsible public entity is considering undertaking under the Act to each county, municipality, and metropolitan planning organization, with respect to each project located within its boundaries. Requires any new transportation facility developed as a project under the Act to be consistent with the regional plan then in existence of any metropolitan planning organization in whose boundaries the project is located. Provides that, prior to the approval of the public-private agreement, the responsible public entity must notify the public at least 60 days prior to the approval of the public-private agreement for any projects under the Act and must hold at least one public meeting within the impacted community. Sets forth additional notice requirements. Sets forth public meeting requirements. Requires the responsible public entity to create a meeting summary including issues raised by the public and respond to all questions in writing no later than 14 days after the meeting. Requires the responsible public entity to post the summary and responses to the responsible public entity's publicly accessible website. Makes other changes.
Title
PUBLIC-PRIVATE PARTNER-NOTICES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024 |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Procurement |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
630 | 5 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3798&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3798.htm |