IN HB1001 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 205
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 205
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Biennial budget.
Title
Biennial budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-27 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-27 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 14 (Lanane), rejected (Y: 12 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 8 (Tallian), rejected (Y: 14 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 12 (Tallian), rejected (Y: 13 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 13 (Tallian), rejected (Y: 13 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 3 (Tallian), rejected (Y: 12 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 11 (Tallian), rejected (Y: 12 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 6 (Tallian), rejected (Y: 12 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House - Amendment 6 (Pryor), prevailed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House - Amendment 5 (Porter), failed (Y: 31 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
House - House - Roll Call 203 (Y: 64 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-27 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 14 (Lanane), rejected (Y: 12 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 8 (Tallian), rejected (Y: 14 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 12 (Tallian), rejected (Y: 13 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 13 (Tallian), rejected (Y: 13 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 3 (Tallian), rejected (Y: 12 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 11 (Tallian), rejected (Y: 12 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 6 (Tallian), rejected (Y: 12 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House - Amendment 6 (Pryor), prevailed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House - Amendment 5 (Porter), failed (Y: 31 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
House - House - Roll Call 203 (Y: 64 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 205 |
2013-05-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 591: yeas 39, nays 11 |
2013-04-27 | House | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 664: yeas 70, nays 30 |
2013-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-04-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-26 | House | Representative Crouch added as conferee |
2013-04-26 | House | Representative Crouch removed as House advisor |
2013-04-26 | House | Representative Porter removed as conferee |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as conferee |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senator Hershman removed as advisor |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senator Tallian removed as conferee |
2013-04-18 | House | Representative Turner added as coauthor |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Skinner, Hume, Hershman, Mishler, Charbonneau, Pat Miller, Wyss and Delph |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Kenley and Tallian |
2013-04-11 | House | House advisors appointed: Turner, Thompson, Dermody, Crouch, Cherry, Candelaria Reardon, Goodin, Kersey, Klinker, Niezgodski, Pryor and Stemler |
2013-04-11 | House | House conferees appointed: T. Brown and Porter |
2013-04-11 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 411: yeas 38 and nays 12 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senator Buck added as cosponsor |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment 14 (Lanane), rejected; Roll Call 393: yeas 12, nays 37 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment 15 (Lanane), rejected; voice vote |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment 8 (Tallian), rejected; Roll Call 392: yeas 14, nays 34 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment 4 (Tallian), rejected; Division of the Senate: yeas 11, nays 37 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment 19 (Broden), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment 9 (Tallian), rejected; voice vote |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment 12 (Tallian), rejected; Roll Call 391: yeas 13, nays 36 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment 16 (Lanane), rejected; voice vote |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment 7 (Tallian), rejected; voice vote |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment 18 (Stoops), rejected; voice vote |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment 10 (Tallian), withdrawn |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment 13 (Tallian), rejected; Roll Call 390: yeas 13, nays 36 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment 5 (Tallian), rejected; voice vote |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment 3 (Tallian), rejected; Roll Call 389: yeas 12, nays 37 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Waltz), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment 11 (Tallian), rejected; Roll Call 388: yeas 12, nays 37 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment 6 (Tallian), rejected; Roll Call 387: yeas 12, nays 37 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment 21 (Kenley), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment 2 (Hershman), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as cosponsor |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as second sponsor |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senator Tallian removed as second sponsor |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-02-25 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Kenley and Tallian |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 245: yeas 68, nays 28 |
2013-02-21 | House | Amendment 6 (Pryor), prevailed; Roll Call 204: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2013-02-21 | House | Ruling of the Chair appealed. Ruling sustained; Roll Call 203: yeas 64, nays 31 |
2013-02-21 | House | Amendment 1 (Goodin), ruled out of order |
2013-02-21 | House | Amendment 5 (Porter), failed; Roll Call 202: yeas 31, nays 65 |
2013-02-21 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-19 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-15 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-01-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative Porter |
2013-01-15 | House | Authored by Representative T. Brown |