IN HB1001 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 146
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 146
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Road funding. At the end of state fiscal year 2016, transfers state reserves that exceed 11.5% of general revenue appropriations as follows: (1) 55% to the state highway fund. (2) 45% to the local road and bridge matching grant fund. Provides that use tax collected on sales of gasoline is distributed differently than ordinary sales and use tax collections. Allows a county that uses a transportation asset management plan approved by the Indiana department of transportation (department) to impose the county motor vehicle license excise surtax and the county wheel tax at higher rates. Authorizes an eligible municipality to impose
Title
Road funding. At the end of state fiscal year 2016, transfers state reserves that exceed 11.5% of general revenue appropriations as follows: (1) 55% to the state highway fund. (2) 45% to the local road and bridge matching grant fund. Provides that use tax collected on sales of gasoline is distributed differently than ordinary sales and use tax collections. Allows a county that uses a transportation asset management plan approved by the Indiana department of transportation (department) to impose the county motor vehicle license excise surtax and the county wheel tax at higher rates. Authorizes an eligible municipality to impose
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #4 (Lanane) failed (Y: 17 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #9 (Tallian) failed (Y: 12 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House - Amendment #11 (Forestal) failed (Y: 28 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-01-28 - House - House - Minority report (Porter) not substituted for majority report (Y: 29 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #4 (Lanane) failed (Y: 17 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #9 (Tallian) failed (Y: 12 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House - Amendment #11 (Forestal) failed (Y: 28 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-01-28 - House - House - Minority report (Porter) not substituted for majority report (Y: 29 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Public Law 146 |
2016-03-23 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-10 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2016-03-10 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 455: yeas 91, nays 5 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 409: yeas 46, nays 4 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Hershman, Stoops, Yoder and Miller Pete |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Kenley and Tallian |
2016-03-03 | House | House advisors appointed: Brown T, Huston, Sullivan, Frye R, Austin, Goodin and Porter |
2016-03-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Soliday and Forestal |
2016-03-02 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2016-03-02 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 241: yeas 39, nays 11 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senator Miller, Pat added as cosponsor |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Lanane) failed; Roll Call 235: yeas 17, nays 33 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Tallian) failed; voice vote |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amendment #9 (Tallian) failed; Roll Call 234: yeas 12, nays 38 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Tallian) failed; voice vote |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Kenley) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Kenley) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amendment #8 (Banks) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-02-02 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Tallian |
2016-02-02 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Kenley, Hershman, Arnold |
2016-02-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 131: yeas 61, nays 36 |
2016-02-01 | House | Representatives Frye, Sullivan, Braun added as coauthors |
2016-02-01 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2016-02-01 | House | Amendment #11 (Forestal) failed; Roll Call 106: yeas 28, nays 66 |
2016-02-01 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-28 | House | Minority report (Porter) not substituted for majority report: Roll Call 76: yeas 29, nays 67 |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2016-01-21 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-13 | House | Representative Steuerwald added as coauthor |
2016-01-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2016-01-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative Brown T |
2016-01-11 | House | Authored by Representative Soliday |