IN HB1009 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a law enforcement officer to obtain a search warrant in order to use an unmanned aerial vehicle, with certain exceptions. Exempts electronic or video toll collection activities and facilities from certain restrictions relating to video and electronic surveillance and data collection. Provides that a law enforcement officer may not compel a person to provide a passkey, password, or keycode to any electronic communication service, electronic device, or electronic storage, or any form of stored electronic user data without a valid search warrant issued by a judge. Prohibits a law enforcement officer or law enforcement agency from using a real time tracking instrument that is capable of obtaining geolocation information concerning a cellular device or a device connected to a cellular network unless certain conditions are met. Provides that, except for a law enforcement officer or governmental entity who has obtained a search warrant, a person who knowingly or intentionally places a camera or electronic surveillance equipment that records images or data of any kind while unattended on the private property of another person without the consent of the owner or tenant of the private property commits a Class A misdemeanor. Establishes a procedure to use electronic mail to apply for a warrant. Provides immunity from civil and criminal liability for certain entities that provide information pursuant to certain court orders. Provides certain procedures for the issuance of search warrants concerning electronic communication service or remote computing service that affect the law concerning a journalist's privilege against disclosure of an information source. Urges the legislative council to assign to a study committee during the 2014 legislative interim the topic of digital
Title
Surveillance and privacy.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Rep. Matt Pierce [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Michael Young [R] |
Sen. Travis Holdman [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 83 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 100903 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 100901 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 100903 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 100901 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | Public Law 170 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 416: yeas 83 and nays 6 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 279: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | HB 1009 Amendment #1 (Steele), prevailed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator M. Young added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Placed back on 2nd Reading |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senator Waterman added third sponsor. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senator Tomes added second sponsor. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 166: yeas 85 and nays 11 |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Steele added as sponsor. |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1009 Amendment #1 (Koch), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee report: do pass amend, adopted. |
2014-01-15 | House | Representative Pierce added as coauthor. |
2014-01-07 | House | First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code |
2014-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Koch |