IN HB1017 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Public Law 13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Public Law 13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle matters. Defines: (1) "commercial motor vehicle", "gross combination weight rating", "gross combination weight", and "gross vehicle weight rating" for purposes of commercial motor vehicles to comply with federal standards; and (2) "gross vehicle weight" for purposes of commercial motor vehicles. Provides for an exception relating to overweight vehicles for certain vehicles transporting logs, wood chips, bark, and sawdust. Amends the definition of "farm tractor" to include farm tractors in the definition of "implement of agriculture". Excludes wagons, trailers, and other vehicles pulled by a farm tractor from the definition of "farm tractor". Makes technical corrections.
Title
Motor vehicle matters. Defines: (1) "commercial motor vehicle", "gross combination weight rating", "gross combination weight", and "gross vehicle weight rating" for purposes of commercial motor vehicles to comply with federal standards; and (2) "gross vehicle weight" for purposes of commercial motor vehicles. Provides for an exception relating to overweight vehicles for certain vehicles transporting logs, wood chips, bark, and sawdust. Amends the definition of "farm tractor" to include farm tractors in the definition of "implement of agriculture". Excludes wagons, trailers, and other vehicles pulled by a farm tractor from the definition of "farm tractor". Makes technical corrections.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Cherry [R] | Rep. James Baird [R] | Rep. Greg Beumer [R] | Rep. Mike Braun [R] |
Rep. Terry Goodin [D] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Public Law 13 |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-03-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 283: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Homeland Security & Transportation |
2015-02-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-01-27 | House | Senator Arnold added second sponsor |
2015-01-27 | House | Senator Crider added first sponsor |
2015-01-22 | House | Representative Goodin added as coauthor |
2015-01-22 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-01-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 12: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2015-01-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-15 | House | Representative Braun M added as coauthor |
2015-01-15 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-12 | House | Representatives Baird and Beumer added as coauthors |
2015-01-06 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2015-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Cherry |