IN HB1035 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 60
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 60
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Code revision corrections. Resolves substantive problems in the Indiana Code. Resolves various nontechnical conflicts and problems not suitable for resolution in the annual technical corrections bill, including: (1) a statute that has been both added and repealed; (2) ambiguous language; (3) incorrect references; and (4) results that must not have been intended. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the code revision commission.)
Title
Code revision corrections. Resolves substantive problems in the Indiana Code. Resolves various nontechnical conflicts and problems not suitable for resolution in the annual technical corrections bill, including: (1) a statute that has been both added and repealed; (2) ambiguous language; (3) incorrect references; and (4) results that must not have been intended. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the code revision commission.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Public Law 60 |
2016-03-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-02-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 181: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-01-19 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Young, M. |
2016-01-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 14: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2016-01-14 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-11 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative Kersey |
2016-01-05 | House | Authored by Representative Washburne |