IN HB1089 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Public Law 108
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Public Law 108
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Veteran service officers. Requires the Indiana veterans' affairs commission to submit an annual report to the governor and the legislative council on matters concerning the welfare of veterans. Allows the mayor of a city to employ a service officer to serve the veterans of the city. Includes a county service officer appointed by the governor in the membership of the Indiana veterans' affairs commission. Urges the legislative council to assign to a study committee the topic of district service officers. Provides that the study committee shall issue a final report to the legislative council containing the study committee's findings and
Title
Veteran service officers. Requires the Indiana veterans' affairs commission to submit an annual report to the governor and the legislative council on matters concerning the welfare of veterans. Allows the mayor of a city to employ a service officer to serve the veterans of the city. Includes a county service officer appointed by the governor in the membership of the Indiana veterans' affairs commission. Urges the legislative council to assign to a study committee the topic of district service officers. Provides that the study committee shall issue a final report to the legislative council containing the study committee's findings and
Sponsors
Rep. Randall Frye [R] | Rep. Dan Forestal [D] | Rep. Bruce Borders [R] | Rep. Lloyd Arnold [R] |
Sen. James Banks [R] | Sen. Carlin Yoder [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] | Sen. Mark Stoops [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | Public Law 108 |
2016-03-22 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 443: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2016-03-10 | House | Dissent withdrawn |
2016-03-10 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Yoder, Stoops and Perfect |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Banks and Arnold J |
2016-03-03 | House | House advisors appointed: Baird, Soliday and Forestal |
2016-03-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Frye R and Macer |
2016-03-02 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2016-03-02 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 257: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as second sponsor |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as cosponsor |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as cosponsor |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs & The Military |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-01-26 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Banks |
2016-01-26 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 63: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2016-01-25 | House | Amendment #1 (Frye R) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-01-25 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-01-21 | House | Representatives Borders and Arnold added as coauthors |
2016-01-21 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2016-01-13 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-11 | House | Representative Forestal added as coauthor |
2016-01-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2016-01-05 | House | Authored by Representative Frye R |