IN HB1219 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the definitions of "farm product" and "farm vehicles" for purposes of the motor vehicle law. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Farm products and vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Roll Call 121902 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Roll Call 121901 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Roll Call 121902 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Roll Call 121901 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-27 | House | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | House | Public Law 215 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 315: yeas 34 and nays 14 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2014-01-29 | House | Representative Klinker added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Friend added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Battles added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Senator Crider added as third sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Senator Arnold added as second sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 85: yeas 92 and nays 0 |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-28 | House | Senator Wyss added as sponsor. |
2014-01-27 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-14 | House | First Reading: Referred to Roads and Transportation |
2014-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Cherry. |