IN HB1283 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Public Law 25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Public Law 25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Standard deduction eligibility. Specifies that, to be eligible for a homestead deduction for property that an individual is buying under contract, the contract must obligate the owner to convey title to the individual upon completion of all of the individual's contract obligations.
Title
Standard deduction eligibility. Specifies that, to be eligible for a homestead deduction for property that an individual is buying under contract, the contract must obligate the owner to convey title to the individual upon completion of all of the individual's contract obligations.
Sponsors
Rep. Cherrish Pryor [D] | Rep. Milo Smith [R] | Rep. Gregory Porter [D] | Rep. Peggy Mayfield [R] |
Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Public Law 25 |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-03-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senator Walker added as second sponsor |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 306: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Hershman added as sponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 163: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2015-02-16 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-12 | House | Representatives Porter and Mayfield added as coauthor |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-13 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-01-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative Smith M |
2015-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Pryor |