IN HB1294 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 78
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 78
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Restraint of pregnant inmates; pregnancy from certain sex offenses. Provides that a correctional facility, including a jail, shall: (1) use the least restrictive restraints necessary on a pregnant inmate when the pregnant inmate is in the second or third trimester of pregnancy; or (2) use no restraints on a pregnant inmate who is in labor, delivering a baby, during the immediate postdelivery period, or dealing with a medical emergency related to the pregnancy, with certain exceptions. Repeals the current statute concerning prenatal and postnatal care and treatment and incorporates it into the new chapter concerning pregnant inmates. Adds sexual misconduct with a service provider as a Level 4 felony to the definition of "violent offense", and requires a person convicted of: (1) sexual misconduct with a service provider; (2) child molesting; and (3) rape; to pay restitution for pregnancy and childbirth expenses to the victim if the pregnancy is a result of the offense.
Title
Restraint of pregnant inmates; pregnancy from certain sex offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Public Law 78 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-02 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 330: yeas 89, nays 0 |
2022-02-22 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senator Pol added as cosponsor |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as cosponsor |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 207: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senators Young M and Walker K added as cosponsors |
2022-02-02 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-25 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Glick and Becker |
2022-01-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 86: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2022-01-24 | House | Representatives Barrett and Summers added as coauthors |
2022-01-24 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-20 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2022-01-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative Ziemke |
2022-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Fleming |