IN HB1616 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-16 - Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-16 - Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Eligibility for child care voucher. Provides that beginning October 1, 2015, a child who is otherwise eligible for participation in the federal Child Care and Development Fund voucher program may continue to participate unless the child's family income exceeds the greater of 250% of the federal income poverty level or 85% of the state median income for the same size family.
Title
Eligibility for child care voucher. Provides that beginning October 1, 2015, a child who is otherwise eligible for participation in the federal Child Care and Development Fund voucher program may continue to participate unless the child's family income exceeds the greater of 250% of the federal income poverty level or 85% of the state median income for the same size family.
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. David Frizzell [R] | Rep. Vanessa Summers [D] | Rep. Julie Olthoff [R] |
Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. John Broden [D] | Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Family & Children Services - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Floor - (Y: 67 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Floor - (Y: 67 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Family & Children Services |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Holdman added as cosponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Grooms added as third sponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Broden added as second sponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Becker added as sponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 174: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2015-02-16 | House | Amendment #4 (Riecken) ruled out of order |
2015-02-16 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2015-01-29 | House | Representatives Frizzell, Summers, Olthoff added as coauthors |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-22 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2015-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Clere |