IN HCR0009 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 54-25)
Status: Passed on January 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-22 - Representative Zent added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 54-25)
Status: Passed on January 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-22 - Representative Zent added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing Indiana's Credit Unions for building a memorial honoring Hoosier veterans.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing Indiana's Credit Unions for building a memorial honoring Hoosier veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Representative Zent added as coauthor |
2018-01-16 | House | Representatives Hamm, Karickhoff, Lehe, Lindauer, Negele, Schaibley, Siegrist, Soliday, Stemler, Ziemke added as coauthors |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Returned to the House |
2018-01-11 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2018-01-11 | House | Representative Candelaria Reardon removed as coauthor |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-09 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Crider |
2018-01-09 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2018-01-09 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Austin, Aylesworth, Bacon, Baird, Bartels, Behning, Beumer, Borders, Bosma, Brown C, Candelaria Reardon, Carbaugh, Cherry, Clere, Cook, Culver, Davisson, DeLaney, DeVon, Dvorak, Eberhart, Engleman, Errington, Forestal, Friend, Frizzell, GiaQuinta, Goodin, Gutwein, Hamilton, Harris, Hatfield, Heaton, Heine, Huston, Judy, Kirchhofer, Klinker, Lehman, Leonard, Lucas, Lyness, Macer, Mahan, Mayfield, Moed, Moseley, Nisly, Ober, Olthoff, Pelath, Porter, Pressel, Pryor, Richardson, Saunders, Shackleford, Smith V, Speedy, Steuerwald, Summers, Taylor J, Torr, VanNatter, Wesco, Wolkins and Wright |
2018-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Bartlett |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2018/resolutions/house/concurrent/9/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/b/8/cab81807/HC0009.01.INTR.pdf |