IN SB0177 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Committee report: do pass, adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Committee report: do pass, adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Veterinary medicine. Changes the name of the Indiana board of veterinary medical examiners to the Indiana board of veterinary medicine (board). Provides that the state veterinarian: (1) serves as the chief administrative officer of the board; (2) performs the duties delegated by the board to the state veterinarian; and (3) provides technical advice and assistance to the board. Establishes the Indiana center for animal policy (center) to facilitate the coordination of regulatory duties of the state board of animal health (BOAH) and the board. Provides that the state veterinarian is the chief administrative officer of the center and the BOAH. Requires that the BOAH (not the professional licensing agency) perform certain administrative functions for the board. Requires that the board and the division of consumer protection, office of the attorney general enter into a memorandum of understanding to share information concerning complaints and investigations against individuals regulated by the board. Allows the board to adopt emergency rules. Provides that the board, and the state veterinarian if authorized by the board, may subpoena witnesses and compel the production of certain documents as part of an investigation. Changes the name of the veterinary investigative fund to the veterinary medicine fund (fund). Makes various changes to the fund. Provides that the changes made by the bill do not apply until July 1, 2023. Provides for transition and makes conforming changes.
Title
Veterinary medicine.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Rep. Donald Lehe [R] | Rep. Craig Snow [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Snow C |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lehe |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 155: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senator Glick added as second author |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising |