IN SB0187 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Public Law 53
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Public Law 53
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child care. Specifies civil penalties for violations by child care providers of safe sleep related requirements. Requires deposit of all civil penalties in the division of family resources child care fund. Specifies that a child care ministry registration expires two years after issuance. Provides an administrative procedure for child care ministry application and registration denial, suspension, and revocation. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Child care. Specifies civil penalties for violations by child care providers of safe sleep related requirements. Requires deposit of all civil penalties in the division of family resources child care fund. Specifies that a child care ministry registration expires two years after issuance. Provides an administrative procedure for child care ministry application and registration denial, suspension, and revocation. Makes conforming amendments.
Sponsors
Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Rep. Kevin Mahan [R] | Rep. Julie Olthoff [R] | Rep. Vanessa Summers [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Public Law 53 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-02-28 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2018-02-28 | House | Representative Summers added as cosponsor |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 232: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2018-02-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-22 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | Representative Olthoff added as cosponsor |
2018-02-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as second author |
2018-01-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Mahan |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 57: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holdman |