IN SB0286 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Public Law 39
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Public Law 39
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Selection of poet laureate. Amends the membership of the poet laureate selection committee. Provides that the selection committee shall meet on a biennial basis or as needed. Provides that a person selected as poet laureate may serve one additional consecutive term. Amends the commission's payments for the poet laureate.
Title
Selection of poet laureate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Public Law 39 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2024-02-21 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2024-02-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 181: yeas 91, nays 2 |
2024-02-19 | House | Representatives Jordan and Campbell added as cosponsors |
2024-02-15 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-02-13 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-02-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senator Bassler added as coauthor |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Pfaff |
2024-01-30 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Clere |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 71: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senators Alting, Becker, Niezgodski added as coauthors |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senator Young M added as second author |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-01-16 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Authored by Senator Goode |