IN SB0308 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Public Law 100
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Public Law 100
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a professional sports development area (PSDA) in Allen County to be amended after April 30, 2014, and before January 1, 2015. Provides that a PSDA in Allen County must terminate before the later of January 1, 2028, or (if the designating body takes final action on the financing before January 1, 2015) a date agreed to jointly by the budget agency and the designating body that established the tax area. Specifies that the expiration date may not be later than 25 years after the debt to finance the facility or proposed facility is issued, and that the budget agency must approve the final financing for the facility or proposed facility.
Title
Sports and convention development areas.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Wyss [R] | Sen. David Long [R] | Sen. Timothy Skinner [D] | Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D] |
Rep. Steven Braun [R] | Rep. Robert Heaton [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 35 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 32 N: 55 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 030802 (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 030801 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 35 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 32 N: 55 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Roll Call 030802 (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 030801 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Public Law 100 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 386: yeas 46 and nays 1 |
2014-03-11 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 442: yeas 84 and nays 6 |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Ober added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative GiaQuinta added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Porter added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Kersey added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Braun added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Torr added as advisor |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senator Kenley added as advisor |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as advisor |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as advisor |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as advisor |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as advisor |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as advisor |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as conferee |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senator Wyss added as conferee |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2014-02-27 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-02-27 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 341: yeas 58 and nays 35 |
2014-02-26 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-26 | House | SB 308 Amendment #5 (DeLaney), prevailed. |
2014-02-26 | House | SB 308 Amendment #6 (Porter), prevailed. |
2014-02-26 | House | SB 308 Amendment #8 (Porter), failed. |
2014-02-26 | House | SB 308 Amendment #1 (Saunders), failed. |
2014-02-26 | House | SB 308 Amendment #7 (Porter), failed. |
2014-02-24 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-18 | House | Representative Heaton added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-18 | House | Representative Braun added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Ober added sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senator Skinner added as coauthor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 177: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Long added as second author. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Appropriations |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Wyss. |