IN SB0333 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 224
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 224
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Body cavity searches and blood draws. Establishes a procedure authorizing licensed medical personnel to obtain a body fluid sample or to retrieve contraband from the body cavity of an individual as part of a criminal investigation, and, grants, with certain exceptions, immunity to medical personnel. Provides a method for certain emergency medical services providers and law enforcement officers who have been exposed to blood or body fluids to obtain the results of a test for a dangerous communicable disease. Establishes a procedure for a court to issue an emergency ex parte order for a blood or body fluid specimen.
Title
Body cavity searches and blood draws. Establishes a procedure authorizing licensed medical personnel to obtain a body fluid sample or to retrieve contraband from the body cavity of an individual as part of a criminal investigation, and, grants, with certain exceptions, immunity to medical personnel. Provides a method for certain emergency medical services providers and law enforcement officers who have been exposed to blood or body fluids to obtain the results of a test for a dangerous communicable disease. Establishes a procedure for a court to issue an emergency ex parte order for a blood or body fluid specimen.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Kevin Mahan [R] |
Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-05 | Senate | Public Law 224 |
2019-05-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 614: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 645: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2019-04-24 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2019-04-18 | House | House advisors appointed: McNamara, May and Hatcher |
2019-04-18 | House | House conferees appointed: Mahan and Pierce |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Head, Taylor G and Freeman |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Grooms and Randolph Lonnie M |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2019-03-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 361: yeas 88, nays 0 |
2019-03-26 | House | Amendment #1 (Young J) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-03-26 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative McNamara |
2019-02-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Mahan |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 189: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Grooms) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senator Head added as second author |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Grooms |