IN SB0336 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Public Law 101
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Public Law 101
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mine subsidence. Allows the post-1977 abandoned mine reclamation fund to be used for the restoration of land that has been affected by surface coal mining operations. Removes the requirement that mine subsidence be caused by the collapse of inactive coal mines abandoned before August 3, 1977. Removes the exclusion of public buildings from the definition of structure. Provides that mine subsidence coverage must include coverage of up to $15,000 for additional living expenses reasonably and necessarily incurred by an insured who is temporarily displaced as a direct result of damage caused by mine subsidence to the covered structure in which
Title
Mine subsidence. Allows the post-1977 abandoned mine reclamation fund to be used for the restoration of land that has been affected by surface coal mining operations. Removes the requirement that mine subsidence be caused by the collapse of inactive coal mines abandoned before August 3, 1977. Removes the exclusion of public buildings from the definition of structure. Provides that mine subsidence coverage must include coverage of up to $15,000 for additional living expenses reasonably and necessarily incurred by an insured who is temporarily displaced as a direct result of damage caused by mine subsidence to the covered structure in which
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Public Law 101 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-02-23 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2016-02-23 | House | Representatives Baird, Morrison, Arnold, Braun, Negele, Washburne, Borders, Ellington J, Koch, Davisson, McNamara, Riecken added as cosponsors |
2016-02-23 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2016-02-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 211: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2016-02-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-16 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-02-15 | House | Representative Kersey added as cosponsor |
2016-02-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2016-02-09 | House | Representatives Heaton and Sullivan added as cosponsors |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Bacon |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 112: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senator Ford added as coauthor |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as coauthor |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senator Bassler added as coauthor |
2016-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senators Becker and Messmer |