IN SB0383 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Public Law 104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Public Law 104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
System integrity adjustments. Provides that an eligible water or wastewater utility may petition the utility regulatory commission (commission) to charge a system integrity adjustment to recover or credit an adjustment amount based on the eligible utility's revenues. Provides that a the commission, after a hearing, shall approve a properly calculated system integrity adjustment. Provides that a utility may collect a system integrity adjustment until the earlier of: (1) 48 months after the date on which the utility is allowed to begin collecting the system integrity adjustment; or (2) the date on which the commission issues an order in the utility's
Title
System integrity adjustments. Provides that an eligible water or wastewater utility may petition the utility regulatory commission (commission) to charge a system integrity adjustment to recover or credit an adjustment amount based on the eligible utility's revenues. Provides that a the commission, after a hearing, shall approve a properly calculated system integrity adjustment. Provides that a utility may collect a system integrity adjustment until the earlier of: (1) 48 months after the date on which the utility is allowed to begin collecting the system integrity adjustment; or (2) the date on which the commission issues an order in the utility's
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Public Law 104 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 342: yeas 43, nays 1 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2016-03-01 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2016-03-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 313: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2016-02-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senator Steele added as coauthor |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Koch, Stemler, Hale |
2016-02-03 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative VanNatter |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 174: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as third author |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Breaux) failed; voice vote |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Charbonneau) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as second author |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Charbonneau |