IN SB0414 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 192
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 192
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Onsite waste management districts and septage holding tanks. Amends the definition of "onsite residential sewage discharging disposal system" to provide that the term includes a system that employs advanced treatment components to reduce the concentration of the pathogenic constituents of the effluent to an acceptable level before the effluent is discharged. Amends the law that prohibits the point source (i.e., above ground) discharge of treated sewage from a dwelling, which includes an exception to the prohibition for one particular county that has a onsite waste management district, to make the exception applicable to any onsite waste management district. Authorizes the adoption of rules or guidelines to provide guidance to a local health department that has jurisdiction in a county onsite waste management district and that is authorized to issue operating permits for onsite residential sewage discharging disposal systems that discharge effluent above ground. Provides that, if amending the National Pollutant Discharge Elimination System (NPDES) general permit issued by the department of environmental management (department) for the purposes of the county onsite waste management district law is necessary or advisable to enable new county onsite waste management districts to function properly and effectively, the department shall amend the general permit as soon as reasonably possible after June 30, 2023. Provides that septage that originates from a residential or commercial source may be held in one or more holding tanks of not more than 10,000 gallons until removed and transported from the site. Establishes requirements for septage holding tanks. Requires a permit from the local health department for the operation of a septage holding tank. Requires a septage tank owner to: (1) enter into a written contract with a septage management vehicle operator for regular removal of septage from the tank; (2) provide a copy of the contract to the local health department; and (3) provide proof to the local health department that the tank owner is regularly paying for the removal of septage from the holding tank. Requires a local health department to report to the department concerning the septage tanks in its jurisdiction, and authorizes the adoption of rules or guidelines concerning the reports.
Title
Onsite waste management districts and septage holding tanks.
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Byrne [R] | Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] |
Sen. James Tomes [R] | Rep. Karen Engleman [R] | Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Joanna King [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 62 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Errington) failed (Y: 32 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 62 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Errington) failed (Y: 32 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Public Law 192 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 493: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2023-04-26 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 510: yeas 90, nays 1 |
2023-04-25 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2023-04-25 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Yoder, Byrne and Glick |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Niemeyer and Niezgodski |
2023-04-18 | House | House advisors appointed: Morrison, Aylesworth and Bauer M |
2023-04-18 | House | House conferees appointed: Engleman and Errington |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2023-03-29 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2023-03-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 317: yeas 63, nays 30 |
2023-03-27 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-03-27 | House | Amendment #2 (Errington) failed; Roll Call 299: yeas 32, nays 64 |
2023-03-27 | House | Amendment #4 (Lehman) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as coauthor |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as coauthor |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as third author |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski removed as coauthor |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Miller D and King J |
2023-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Engleman |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 71: yeas 44, nays 5 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senator Sandlin added as second author |
2023-01-19 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Authored by Senator Byrne |
Subjects
ENVIRONMENTAL MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT AND AGENCIES
HEALTH, State Department and Agencies
LAND AND LANDOWNERS
SOLID WASTE
HEALTH, State Department and Agencies
LAND AND LANDOWNERS
SOLID WASTE