KS HB2262 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute HB 2262 by Committee on Appropriations - Amending the percentage amount that is deposited into the oil and gas valuation depletion trust fund from 12.41% to 8.25%.
Title
Substitute HB 2262 by Committee on Appropriations - Amending the percentage amount that is deposited into the oil and gas valuation depletion trust fund from 12.41% to 8.25%.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 96 Nay: 23 (Y: 96 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-03-26 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 96 Nay: 23 |
2013-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2013-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by |
2013-02-25 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 27, 2013, 9:00 AM Room 112-N |
2013-02-20 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 26, 2013, 9:00 AM Room 112-N-CANCELLED |
2013-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-02-07 | House | House Introduced |