KS HB2422 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died on Senate Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died on Senate Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2422 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Exempting certain gaming suppliers from the certification requirement of the Kansas expanded lottery act when such suppliers do not contract with the state or the lottery gaming facility manager.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2422 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Exempting certain gaming suppliers from the certification requirement of the Kansas expanded lottery act when such suppliers do not contract with the state or the lottery gaming facility manager.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 1 (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate Calendar |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2023-03-16 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 1 |
2023-03-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2023-03-07 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2023-03-02 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 2, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2023-02-15 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2023-02-15 | House | House Introduced |