KS S0278 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Creating the Kansas DUI commission; correctional services special revenue fund; driver improvement clinics; penalties for driving under the influence; information sent to KBI central repository. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Creating the Kansas DUI commission; correctional services special revenue fund; driver improvement clinics; penalties for driving under the influence; information sent to KBI central repository. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-02-02 | Withdrawn from calendar, rereferred to Judiciary -SJ 977 | |
2009-03-04 | CR: Substitute be passed by Judiciary -SJ 260 | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Judiciary -SJ 198 | |
2009-02-17 | Introduced -SJ 189 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |