KS S0524 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Increasing penalties for unlawful sexual relations and requiring offender registration; increasing penalties when staff traffic in dangerous contraband in a correctional facility. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Increasing penalties for unlawful sexual relations and requiring offender registration; increasing penalties when staff traffic in dangerous contraband in a correctional facility. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-02-19 | Withdrawn from Ways and Means -SJ 1084; Rereferred to Judiciary -SJ 1084 | |
2010-02-18 | Hearing: 2/26/2010, Fri., 9:30 am, Rm 548-S; Withdrawn from Judiciary -SJ 1082; Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 1082 | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Judiciary -SJ 988 | |
2010-02-03 | Introduced -SJ 985 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |