KS S0532 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in House committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in House committee
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; issuance of farm winery or microbrewery license to spouse of retailer licensee; issuance of farm winery and microbrewery licenses concurrently. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; issuance of farm winery or microbrewery license to spouse of retailer licensee; issuance of farm winery and microbrewery licenses concurrently. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in House committee | |
2010-03-01 | Referred to Federal and State Affairs -HJ 1026 | |
2010-02-26 | Received and introduced -HJ 1019 | |
2010-02-25 | Engrossed -SJ 1108; FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 39 Nays 0 -SJ 1107 | |
2010-02-24 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -SJ 1101 | |
2010-02-18 | CR: Be passed as am. by Federal and State Affairs -SJ 1062 | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Federal and State Affairs -SJ 993 | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced -SJ 987 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |