KS SB201 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a property tax exemption for land associated with a dam or reservoir and subject to a mitigation easement.
Title
Creating a property tax exemption for land associated with a dam or reservoir and subject to a mitigation easement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb201/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb201_00_0000.pdf |