KS SB251 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Kansas school equity and enhancement act.
Title
Creating the Kansas school equity and enhancement act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, May 19, 2017, 08:30 AM Room 548-S |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, May 18, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 548-S |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Senate Referred to Senate Select Committee on Education Finance |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb251/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb251_00_0000.pdf |