KS SB251 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the filing schedule for business entity information reports with the secretary of state from an annual to a biennial basis effective July 1, 2022.
Title
Changing the filing schedule for business entity information reports with the secretary of state from an annual to a biennial basis effective July 1, 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died on House Calendar |
2020-05-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2020-03-16 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 16, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2020-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2020-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 4, 2020, 8:30 AM Room 548-S |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Prefiled for Introduction on Tuesday, January 7, 2020 |