KY HB14 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-15 - recommitted to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-15 - recommitted to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.2841, relating to college tuition benefits for spouses and children of specified emergency response personnel and public employees who have died in the course of their duties to specify that the beneficiary is eligible for up to a maximum of 128 credit hours of undergraduate instruction; amend KRS 164.2842, relating to college tuition benefits for spouses and children of specified emergency response personnel and public employees who have been totally and permanently disabled in the course of their duties to specify that the beneficiary is eligible for up to a maximum of 128 credit hours of undergraduate instruction.
Title
AN ACT relating to tuition benefits and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 33 (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | Senate | recommitted to Education (S) |
2020-03-26 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-19 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2020-01-30 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-01-24 | House | 3rd reading, passed 88-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-23 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 24, 2020 |
2020-01-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-17 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-13 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to Education (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-06-10 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Cities
Counties
Education, Higher
Emergency Medical Services
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Local Government
Police, City and County
Police, State
Special Districts
Counties
Education, Higher
Emergency Medical Services
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Local Government
Police, City and County
Police, State
Special Districts