KY HB153 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 25)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 25)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 61.510 and 78.510 to provide that creditable compensation shall exclude nominal fees paid to volunteers of a participating agency who begin participating in the Kentucky Employees Retirement System and the County Employees Retirement System on or after August 1, 2016; define "volunteer" and "nominal fee"; amend KRS 61.637 to provide that retirees of Kentucky Retirement Systems who receive reimbursements of actual expenses or nominal fees for their volunteer services shall not be subject to the required breaks in employment and prohibitions on prearranged agreements prior to retirement if the retired member did not receive creditable compensation prior to retirement from the employer for which they are providing volunteer services, any reimbursements or nominal fees received prior to retirement have not been classified as creditable compensation or used to determine retirement benefits, the retired member has not purchased or received service credit for service with the participating employer for which he or she is providing volunteer services, and the retired member does not become an employee, leased employee, or independent contractor of the employer for which he or she is providing volunteer services for a period of at least 24 months.
Title
AN ACT relating to volunteer service with an employer participating in Kentucky Retirement Systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 25) |
2016-03-22 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-22 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-03-22 | House | received in House |
2016-03-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2016-03-18 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 21, 2016 (Consent Orders #1) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-16 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-22 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2016-02-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-02-18 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2016-02-16 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 18, 2016 |
2016-02-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-02 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-05 | House | to State Government (H) |
2016-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
2015-12-11 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |