KY HB23 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-21 - to Committee on Committees (S)
Pending: Senate Committee on Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-21 - to Committee on Committees (S)
Pending: Senate Committee on Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 227 to require a working smoke detector be present in any residence sold; direct seller to attest to the presence and functioning of the required smoke detector in signed affidavit given to buyer at closing.
Title
AN ACT relating to smoke alarms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 118 (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-20 | House | 3rd reading, passed 79-16 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 07, 2024 |
2024-01-18 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-01-17 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-01-12 | House | reassigned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H) |
2024-01-09 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2024-01-02 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-02 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Fire Prevention
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Housing, Building, and Construction
Insurance
Landlord and Tenant
Public Safety
Real Estate
Safety
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Housing, Building, and Construction
Insurance
Landlord and Tenant
Public Safety
Real Estate
Safety