KY HB266 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 153)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 153)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Sets out the 2024-2026 Biennial Highway Construction Plan; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to road projects and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Petrie [R] | Rep. Ken Upchurch [R] | Rep. Adam Bowling [R] | Rep. Josh Bray [R] |
Rep. Peyton Griffee [R] | Rep. Thomas Huff [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 413 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/FINAL fccr1 RSN# 3191 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 3052 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 202 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/FINAL fccr1 RSN# 3191 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 3052 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 202 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 153) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | passed 96-0 with Free Conference Committee Report (1) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report adopted in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference |
2024-03-28 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | received in House |
2024-03-28 | House | passed 37-0 with Free Conference Committee Report (1) |
2024-03-28 | House | Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report (1) |
2024-03-28 | House | Free Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | to Rules (H) |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-26 | House | House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-26 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-26 | House | to Rules (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | received in House |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2024-03-22 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2024-03-21 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2024-03-21 | Senate | 1st reading |
2024-03-21 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-05 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-05 | House | taken from Rules |
2024-03-05 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-29 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-02-29 | House | 2nd reading |
2024-02-29 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-02-28 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-02-28 | House | 1st reading |
2024-02-28 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-02-21 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-02-20 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-20 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Budget and Financial Administration
Effective Dates, Emergency
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
State Agencies
Transportation
Effective Dates, Emergency
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
State Agencies
Transportation