KY HB272 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 28)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 28)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 211.9107 to exempt a residential building contractor installing vent pipes from radon mitigation certification requirements.
Title
AN ACT relating to radon mitigation.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Thompson [D] | Rep. Russ Meyer [D] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Sal Santoro [R] |
Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 28) |
2016-03-24 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2016-03-23 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2016-03-22 | House | received in House |
2016-03-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2016-03-18 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2016-03-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-25 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 92-2 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-02-18 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 22, 2016 |
2016-02-18 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-17 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-01-25 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-20 | House | to Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2016-01-19 | House | introduced in House |