KY HB281 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 68)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 68)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 61.637 to allow a mayor or member of a city legislative body who is not participating in the County Employees Retirement System (CERS) prior to retirement, but who is eligible to retire from the Kentucky Employees Retirement System (KERS) or the State Police Retirement System (SPRS) due to other employment, to retire and draw benefits from KERS or SPRS without resigning from his or her position as mayor or member of the city legislative body.
Title
AN ACT relating to retirement benefits for local elected officials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 68) |
2016-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-03-28 | House | received in House |
2016-03-25 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2016 (Consent Orders #1) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-16 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2016-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 89-1 |
2016-03-10 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) withdrawn |
2016-02-23 | House | floor amendment (1) and (2-title) filed |
2016-02-18 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2016-02-16 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 18, 2016 |
2016-02-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-04 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-21 | House | to State Government (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | introduced in House |