KY HB299 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 106)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 106)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 71.060 to allow jailers to appoint deputy jailers who are nonresidents of the Commonwealth.
Title
AN ACT relating to deputy jailers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1438 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 77 (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 77 (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-24 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 106) |
2020-04-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-04-14 | House | received in House |
2020-04-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 |
2020-04-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, April 14, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-18 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-06 | House | 3rd reading, passed 85-2 with floor amendment (1) |
2020-02-05 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2020-02-03 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 4, 2020 |
2020-01-30 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-29 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-24 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-23 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2020-01-21 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Counties
Jails and Jailers
Local Government
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Public Officers and Employees
Public Protection
Jails and Jailers
Local Government
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Public Officers and Employees
Public Protection