KY HCR168 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 79)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 79)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Direct the Legislative Research Commission to create the Federal Environmental Regulation Impact Assessment Task Force; provide that the purpose of the task force shall be to study the potential effect of federal environmental regulations on the affordability and reliability of electricity generation in the Commonwealth; establish the membership of the task force; require the task force to meet at least three times before the submission of its findings and recommendations; require the task force to submit its findings and recommendations to the Legislative Research Commission by December 4, 2015; allow a majority of members appointed to the task force to vote to recommend to the Legislative Research Commission that an outside entity complete an analysis or study on behalf of the task force; provide that the Legislative Research Commission has authority to alternatively assign the issues identified by the Resolution to an interim joint committee or subcommittee.
Title
Direct the Legislative Research Commission to create the Federal Environmental Regulation Impact Assessment Task Force; provide that the purpose of the task force shall be to study the potential effect of federal environmental regulations on the affordability and reliability of electricity generation in the Commonwealth; establish the membership of the task force; require the task force to meet at least three times before the submission of its findings and recommendations; require the task force to submit its findings and recommendations to the Legislative Research Commission by December 4, 2015; allow a majority of members appointed to the task force to vote to recommend to the Legislative Research Commission that an outside entity complete an analysis or study on behalf of the task force; provide that the Legislative Research Commission has authority to alternatively assign the issues identified by the Resolution to an interim joint committee or subcommittee.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Gooch [R] | Rep. Richard Heath [R] | Rep. Suzanne Miles [R] | Rep. Ryan Quarles [R] |
Rep. Dean Schamore [D] | Rep. Jonathan Shell [R] | Rep. Jill York [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 79) |
2015-03-25 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-24 | House | adopted 93-6 |
2015-03-24 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (2) |
2015-03-24 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitutes and (2), floor amendment (1) |
2015-03-24 | House | to Rules (H) |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (2) |
2015-03-24 | Senate | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Committee Substitute withdrawn |
2015-03-24 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2) as a Consent Bill |
2015-03-23 | Senate | recommitted to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2015-03-11 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-10 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2015 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, adopted 89-0 |
2015-02-27 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2015 |
2015-02-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-26 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2015-02-25 | House | posting waived |
2015-02-24 | House | posting waived |
2015-02-24 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-24 | House | to Tourism Development & Energy (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | introduced in House |