KY SB154 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 88)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 88)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 311.856 to allow the supervising physician, practice, or institution to determine a physician assistant's countersignature requirements; direct the supervising physician to outline the specific parameters for review in the application required by KRS 311.854.
Title
AN ACT relating to physician assistants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-09 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 88) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2016-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2016-03-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2016-03-23 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-17 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-25 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2016-02-24 | House | received in House |
2016-02-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 23, 2016 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-16 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | introduced in Senate |