KY SB158 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch.16)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch.16)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amends KRS 387.278, relating to certain settlements with minors, to establish provisions relating to the opening of restricted accounts and issuance of annuities on behalf of minors entering into settlements; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to settlements with minors and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 338 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2912 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2912 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch.16) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-26 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-26 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 |
2024-03-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 25, 2024 |
2024-02-29 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-28 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-27 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2024-02-16 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-16 | House | received in House |
2024-02-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 15, 2024 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-05 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Banks and Financial Institutions
Children and Minors
Claims
Effective Dates, Emergency
Escheats
Insurance
Securities
Children and Minors
Claims
Effective Dates, Emergency
Escheats
Insurance
Securities