KY SB178 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 157)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 157)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 156.557 to clarify the evaluation requirements for the local superintendent; require that the summative evaluation be discussed and adopted in an open meeting of the local board of education and reflected in the minutes; specify that if the local policy requires a written evaluation that it shall be made available to the public upon request; and require that preliminary discussions relating to the evaluation of the superintendent by the board or between the board and the superintendent prior to the summative evaluation be conducted in closed session.
Title
AN ACT relating to evaluation of superintendents of schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 157) | |
2010-04-01 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-04-01 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2010-03-29 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2010-03-29 | passed 37-0 | |
2010-03-29 | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-29 | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-26 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-25 | 3rd reading, passed 67-29 with Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-24 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 25, 2010 | |
2010-03-24 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-23 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-18 | posted in committee | |
2010-03-11 | to Education (H) | |
2010-03-10 | received in House | |
2010-03-09 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 | |
2010-03-08 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-05 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-04 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-03-01 | to Education (S) | |
2010-02-25 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB178.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB178/bill.doc |