KY SB185 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 18)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 18)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 194A to establish the Advisory Council on Autism Spectrum Disorders and create the Office of Autism; amend KRS 194A.135 to delete the requirement that the Commonwealth Council on Developmental Disabilities appoint a subcommittee including members of the Kentucky Commission on Autism Spectrum Disorders to monitor the state plan and submit reports; repeal KRS 194A.620 and KRS 194A.622; confirm Executive Order 2015-397.
Title
AN ACT relating to autism spectrum disorders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 18) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-03-24 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-23 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2016-03-18 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 23, 2016 |
2016-03-18 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-17 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-10 | House | posted in committee |
2016-03-02 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2016-03-01 | House | received in House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 29, 2016 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-24 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-18 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB185.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB185/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB185/vote_history.pdf |