KY SB31 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - 3rd reading, passed 64-33 with floor amendments (2) and (3-title)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - 3rd reading, passed 64-33 with floor amendments (2) and (3-title)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 216B.015 to define "medical foster home"; amend KRS 216B.020 to exempt medical foster homes from certificate of need requirements.
Title
AN ACT relating to veterans' affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | 3rd reading, passed 64-33 with floor amendments (2) and (3-title) | |
2010-04-15 | floor amendments (2) and (3-title) filed | |
2010-04-15 | taken from Committee, placed in the Orders of the Day | |
2010-03-29 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2010-03-26 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-25 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-03-15 | posted in committee | |
2010-03-11 | recommitted to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2010-03-11 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-10 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-03-08 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-26 | to Military Affairs & Public Safety (H) | |
2010-01-21 | received in House | |
2010-01-21 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 | |
2010-01-20 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 21, 2010 | |
2010-01-15 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-01-14 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-01-06 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB31.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB31/bill.doc |