KY SB56 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 85)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 85)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Summary
Amend various sections in KRS Chapter 189A, relating to driving under the influence, to expand the look-back window for prior offenses from five years to 10 years; amend KRS 189A.330 to expand the window for quarterly reporting of pending DUI cases; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to driving under the influence and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-09 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 85) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-03-29 | Senate | passed 37-0 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-23 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 22, 2016 |
2016-03-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-18 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-14 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-25 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2016-01-21 | House | received in House |
2016-01-20 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-1 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 20 |
2016-01-15 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-01-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-01-07 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2016-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |