LA HB1161 | 2016 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB979
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the composition of the La. State Board of Nursing (EG NO IMPACT SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the composition of the La. State Board of Nursing (EG NO IMPACT SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Dustin Miller [D] | Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R] | Rep. Kenny Cox [D] | Rep. Dodie Horton [R] |
Sen. Katrina Jackson-Andrews [D] | Rep. Tanner Magee [R] | Rep. Thomas Willmott [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1161 ADOPT (#1366) (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 1161 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1353) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 1161 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1315) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1161 FINAL PASSAGE (#1307) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 1161 FINAL PASSAGE (#796) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 1161 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1353) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 1161 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1315) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1161 FINAL PASSAGE (#1307) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 1161 FINAL PASSAGE (#796) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2016. |
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 598. |
2016-06-08 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/8/2016. |
2016-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 4 nays. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2016-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. |
2016-06-06 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2016-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Mills, Martiny, and Boudreaux. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2016-06-06 | House | House conferees appointed: Dustin Miller, Hoffmann, and Jackson. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2016-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2016-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/2016. |
2016-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-05-16 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2016. |
2016-05-09 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-05 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 979 reported by the Committee on Health and Welfare (10-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB979 (Replaces) 2016-05-05 - Becomes HB 1161.