LA HB154 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for prohibited political materials and applicable criminal penalties (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)
Title
Provides for prohibited political materials and applicable criminal penalties (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 154 CO-AUTHORS (#1241) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 154 FINAL PASSAGE (#1240) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - House Vote on HB 154 FINAL PASSAGE (#461) (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 154 FINAL PASSAGE (#1240) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - House Vote on HB 154 FINAL PASSAGE (#461) (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-19 | House | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2024-05-31 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-28 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-11 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 77, nays 22. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-11 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-04-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/11/2024. |
2024-04-10 | House | Notice given. |
2024-04-09 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-09 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-04-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/09/2024. |
2024-04-04 | House | Notice given. |
2024-04-04 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-04 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2024. |
2024-04-03 | House | Notice given. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/03/2024. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported favorably (14-1). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-02-23 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2024. |
2024-02-23 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-02-23 | House | Prefiled. |