LA HB225 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Tall Timbers Crime Prevention and Improvement District in New Orleans
Title
Creates the Tall Timbers Crime Prevention and Improvement District in New Orleans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 225 FINAL PASSAGE (#1054) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 225 FINAL PASSAGE (#295) (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 225 FINAL PASSAGE (#295) (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2024. |
2024-06-03 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 419. |
2024-05-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-22 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-22 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-04 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 17. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2024. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |