LA HB230 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective date: 07/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective date: 07/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the definition of aviation gasoline (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides for the definition of aviation gasoline (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 230 FINAL PASSAGE (#631) (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 230 FINAL PASSAGE (#320) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 230 FINAL PASSAGE (#320) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | House | Effective date: 07/01/17. |
2017-06-12 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 145. |
2017-06-02 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-16 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/17. |
2017-05-15 | House | Notice given. |
2017-05-15 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/17. |
2017-05-09 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |