LA HB268 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Effective date: 06/04/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Effective date: 06/04/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the confidentiality of certain records
Title
Provides relative to the confidentiality of certain records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 268 ADOPT (#1420) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - House - House Vote on HB 268 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1649) (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 268 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1373) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 268 FINAL PASSAGE (#793) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Vote on HB 268 FINAL PASSAGE (#341) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - House - House Vote on HB 268 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1649) (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 268 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1373) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 268 FINAL PASSAGE (#793) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Vote on HB 268 FINAL PASSAGE (#341) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | House | Effective date: 06/04/2024. |
2024-06-04 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 495. |
2024-06-04 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-31 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2024-05-30 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 86, nays 12. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2024-05-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2024. |
2024-05-29 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2024-05-28 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Fields, Kleinpeter, and Miguez. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2024-05-23 | House | House conferees appointed: Mike Johnson, Beaullieu, and Dewitt. |
2024-05-23 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2024-05-23 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2024-05-22 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/23/2024. |
2024-05-20 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-09 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/09/2024. |
2024-04-04 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported favorably (11-3). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |